VA SB533 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Computer trespass; penalty. Expands the crime of computer trespass to provide that the prohibited actions that constitute computer trespass are criminalized if done through intentionally deceptive means and without authority and specifies that a computer hardware or software provider, an interactive computer service, or a telecommunications or cable operator does not have to provide notice of its activities to a computer user that a reasonable computer user should expect may occur.
Title
Computer trespass; expands crime, monitoring location of a minor, etc., by parent or legal guardian.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB533S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105984D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105984D-S1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103459D |