VA SB532 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Display or parking of used motor vehicles for sale; penalty. Clarifies that the prohibition on the display or parking, or permitting the display or parking, of five or more used motor vehicles within any 12-month period on real property to sell or advertise the sale of used motor vehicles applies per property and provides that a property owner or lessee in violation of such prohibition is guilty of a Class 4 misdemeanor. The bill also requires the Motor Vehicle Dealer Board to create a form to place on a vehicle that is in violation of the law. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is identical to HB 1413.
Title
Display or parking of used motor vehicles for sale; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0123) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 123 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB532ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 18-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House (82-Y 18-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB532S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105877D-S1 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (9-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105877D-S1 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103539D |