VA SB532 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532)
Summary
Disclosures in land use proceedings; Loudoun County. Requires each individual member of the Loudoun County board of supervisors, planning commission, and board of zoning appeals in any proceeding before each such body involving an application for a special exception or variance or involving an application for amendment of a zoning ordinance map, which does not constitute the adoption of a comprehensive zoning plan, an ordinance applicable throughout the locality, or an application filed by the board of supervisors that involves more than 10 parcels that are owned by different individuals, trusts, corporations, or other entities, to, prior to any hearing on the matter or at such hearing, make a full public disclosure of any business or financial relationship that such member has, or has had within the 12-month period prior to such hearing, (i) with the applicant in such case; (ii) with the title owner, contract purchaser, or lessee of the land that is the subject of the application, except, in the case of a condominium, with the title owner, contract purchaser, or lessee of 10 percent or more of the units in the condominium; (iii) if any of the foregoing is a trustee (other than a trustee under a corporate mortgage or deed of trust securing one or more issues of corporate mortgage bonds), with any trust beneficiary having an interest in such land; or (iv) with the agent, attorney, or real estate broker of any of the foregoing.
Title
Land use proceedings; disclosures in Loudoun County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0532) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 532 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB532ER) | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-26 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-22 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB532S1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 083038240-S1 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083038240-S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087056240 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB532 |