VA SB529 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Admissibility of statements of a deceased or incompetent party; hearsay exception. Provides that statements made by a deceased or incompetent party when such party was competent shall not be excluded as inadmissible hearsay, provided that such statements are relevant and otherwise admissible. Under current law, such statements are admissible provided that they are relevant. This bill is a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Admissibility of statements of a deceased or incompetent party; hearsay exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Left in Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Recommitted to Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107465D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102382D |