VA SB525 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Tabled in Rules by voice vote
Summary
Uranium mining. Establishes the Virginia Uranium Mining Commission, as a legislative branch advisory commission to assess the risks and benefits of developing uranium resources in Virginia.
Title
Uranium Mining Commission; established, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Phillip Puckett [D] | Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] | Sen. John Watkins [R] |
Sen. Mary Whipple [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Tabled in Rules by voice vote | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 084239340-ES2 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB525ES2 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Hurt agreed to | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute from Rules agreed to 084239340-S2 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources rejected 083968340-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 084239340-S2 | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Rereferred to Rules | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 083968340-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Assigned ACNR sub: Special Subcommittee on SB525 | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083952340 |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards and Institutions Generally
General Assembly
Mines and Mining
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
General Assembly
Mines and Mining
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB525 |