VA SB524 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Payment of prevailing wage; certified payroll; penalties. Requires employers that are subject to prevailing wage provisions for work done on public contracts to furnish the Commissioner of Labor and Industry within 30 days after issuance of its first payroll, and every 30 days thereafter, a certified payroll that consists of a complete copy of certain records accompanied by a statement signed by the employer that indicates that (i) such records are true and accurate, (ii) the hourly rate paid to each worker is not less than the general prevailing rate of hourly wages required by law; and (iii) the contractor or subcontractor is aware that filing a certified payroll that he knows to be false is a Class 6 felony. The bill provides civil penalties not to exceed $1,000 for each violation for violations of prevailing wage provisions for any contractor or subcontractor that (a) knowingly fails to provide the certified pay scale for each craft or trade employed on the project, (b) knowingly fails to provide the certified payroll required by the bill, and (c) fails to post the general prevailing wage rate for each craft and classification involved in a contract in prominent and easily accessible places at the site of the work and a civil penalty not to exceed $10 per calendar day that required records have not been received. The bill also provides that any contractor or subcontractor who knowingly files false records or willfully fails to file records is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Payment of prevailing wage; certified payroll; penalties. Requires employers that are subject to prevailing wage provisions for work done on public contracts to furnish the Commissioner of Labor and Industry within 30 days after issuance of its first payroll, and every 30 days thereafter, a certified payroll that consists of a complete copy of certain records accompanied by a statement signed by the employer that indicates that (i) such records are true and accurate, (ii) the hourly rate paid to each worker is not less than the general prevailing rate of hourly wages required by law; and (iii) the contractor or subcontractor is aware that filing a certified payroll that he knows to be false is a Class 6 felony. The bill provides civil penalties not to exceed $1,000 for each violation for violations of prevailing wage provisions for any contractor or subcontractor that (a) knowingly fails to provide the certified pay scale for each craft or trade employed on the project, (b) knowingly fails to provide the certified payroll required by the bill, and (c) fails to post the general prevailing wage rate for each craft and classification involved in a contract in prominent and easily accessible places at the site of the work and a civil penalty not to exceed $10 per calendar day that required records have not been received. The bill also provides that any contractor or subcontractor who knowingly files false records or willfully fails to file records is guilty of a Class 6 felony.
Title
Payment of prevailing wage; certified payroll, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 4-N) |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102463D |