VA SB522 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB522
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Toll Relief Program; eligibility. Requires the Department of Transportation to expand eligibility for the Toll Relief Program for the tolls on the Downtown and Midtown Tunnels to residents of the Cities of Portsmouth and Norfolk with an income of $45,000 or less per year. The bill requires that all eligible residents receive the same toll relief regardless of income level. The bill provides that funding for the additional toll relief shall be paid by the Commonwealth from the federal American Rescue Plan Act (ARPA), as possible, and any costs not covered by the ARPA shall be the responsibility of the Commonwealth. The bill expires on January 1, 2025.
Title
Toll Relief Program; eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101993D |
Same As/Similar To
SB522 (Carry Over) 2022-02-08 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)