VA SB518 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Changing the Commonwealth's biennial appropriations to begin in odd-numbered years. Provides that the Commonwealth's biennial appropriations start on July 1 of odd-numbered years beginning with the biennial appropriation act for the period July 1, 2023, through June 30, 2025. The bill requires that the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2022, would not be a part of any biennial appropriation act (i.e., it would be a single-year transitional budget).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commonwealth's biennial appropriations; changing to begin in odd-numbered years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2020-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N)
2020-01-08SenateMoved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101477D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011018.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1011020(n/a)See Bill Text
1011322(n/a)See Bill Text
1011402.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1012202.3(n/a)See Bill Text
1012212(n/a)See Bill Text
1012213(n/a)See Bill Text
161309.4(n/a)See Bill Text
221202(n/a)See Bill Text
221503.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221504(n/a)See Bill Text
221506(n/a)See Bill Text
221508(n/a)See Bill Text
221509(n/a)See Bill Text
222400(n/a)See Bill Text
22118.01(n/a)See Bill Text
221253.13:6(n/a)See Bill Text
221289.1(n/a)See Bill Text
2311106(n/a)See Bill Text
231303(n/a)See Bill Text
231306(n/a)See Bill Text
332232(n/a)See Bill Text
332352(n/a)See Bill Text
4621503.5(n/a)See Bill Text
511145(n/a)See Bill Text
53182.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5411118(n/a)See Bill Text
541114(n/a)See Bill Text
5412113(n/a)See Bill Text
5414421(n/a)See Bill Text
5811011(n/a)See Bill Text
5811021.04:1(n/a)See Bill Text
62144.15:6(n/a)See Bill Text
91167(n/a)See Bill Text
91172(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback