VA SB517 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Expungement of certain charges and convictions. Allows a person to petition for expungement of convictions and deferred disposition dismissals for marijuana possession, underage alcohol possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol when the offense occurred prior to the person's twenty-first birthday, all court costs, fines, and restitution have been paid, and five years have elapsed since the date of completion of all terms of sentencing and probation. The bill provides that any person seeking expungement of a marijuana possession or alcohol-related charge shall be assessed a $150 fee, which shall be paid into the state treasury and credited to the Department of State Police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charges and convictions, certain; expungement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29SenateIncorporated by Judiciary
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101476D

Same As/Similar To

SB608 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Left in Courts of Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback