VA SB5117 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - first day of the fourth month following the month adjournment sine die of this special session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of the Governor; executive orders; penalty. Provides that a violation of an executive order declared by the Governor as the Director of Emergency Management shall be punishable either as a civil penalty of not more than $500 or as a Class 1 misdemeanor. Under current law, the only penalty for such a violation is a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also mandates that a violation of an executive order that is punishable as a civil penalty shall be charged by summons and may be executed by a law-enforcement officer when such violation is observed by the officer. The proceeds of any such civil penalty that is imposed shall be paid and collected only in lawful money of the United States and paid into the state treasury to the credit of the Literary Fund. This bill has an expiration date of June 30, 2023, and is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of the Governor, executive orders, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (56-Y 41-N) (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21Senatefirst day of the fourth month following the month adjournment sine die of this special session)
2020-10-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 15 (Per Article IV, Section 13, this bill will be effective on the
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5117ER)
2020-10-07SenateEnrolled
2020-10-02SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (56-Y 41-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House with amendment (56-Y 41-N)
2020-09-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-09-25HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-21HouseReported from Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-04SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-09-03SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-09-02SenateRead first time
2020-08-31SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 5-N)
2020-08-31SenateReconsidered by General Laws and Technology
2020-08-27SenateFailed to report (defeated) in General Laws and Technology (7-Y 7-N)
2020-08-19SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-08-19SenatePresented and ordered printed 20200839D

Same As/Similar To

HB5093 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - first day of the fourth month following the month adjournment sine die of this special session)

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback