VA SB5109 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Commissioner of Health; nursing home and assisted living facility employees and residents; priority for testing; COVID-19 pandemic. Provides that the Commissioner of Health shall ensure that residents and employees of any nursing home or assisted living facility receive first priority for any testing indicating the existence of the COVID-19 virus in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing home/assisted living facility employees/residents; priority for testing for COVID-19 virus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-17 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseTabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-03SenateRead third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-09-02SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB5109S1
2020-09-02SenateSubstitute by Senator Chafin agreed to 20201073D-S1
2020-09-02SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-02SenateRead second time
2020-09-02SenateFloor substitute printed 20201073D-S1 (Chafin)
2020-08-27SenateRead first time
2020-08-26SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-18SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-08-18SenatePresented and ordered printed 20200545D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32145.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback