VA SB5101 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Private school employees and volunteers; essential workers; personal protective equipment during certain declared states of emergency; emergency. Provides that during any case in which the Governor has declared a state of emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat, individuals working or volunteering in a private elementary or secondary school in the Commonwealth shall be considered essential workers and shall be included in any group afforded priority with regard to access to personal protective equipment during such state of emergency. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Private school employees and volunteers; essential workers, personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | House | Left in Education |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200768D |