VA SB5100 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; COVID-19-related absences. Excuses from school attendance children diagnosed with COVID-19 or children with a household member diagnosed with COVID-19 while the child or household member is suffering from COVID-19.
Title
Public schools; COVID-19-related absences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | House | Left in Education |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200720D |