VA SB5090 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 7 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commissioner of Health; publication of information related to COVID-19; COVID-19 indicators. Requires that for the duration of the emergency declared by the Governor in response to COVID-19, the Commissioner of Health shall make available to the public on a website maintained by the Department of Health information about confirmed cases of COVID-19 in the Commonwealth, by week and by health district, including (i) the total number of confirmed cases of COVID-19; (ii) the number of confirmed cases by age group and by race and ethnicity; and (iii) the percentage of cases that are known to be associated with a nursing home, assisted living facility, or correctional facility. The bill also requires the Commissioner to make available to the public on a website maintained by the Department of Health information about and analyses of such data and to develop and publish COVID-19 indicators with thresholds to include case incidence rate, percentage of polymerase chain reaction (PCR) tests that are positive, rate of COVID-like illness visits to emergency departments, rate of current confirmed COVID-19 intensive care unit hospitalizations, and percentage of hospital beds that are currently occupied.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COVID-19 virus; Commissioner of Health shall make information available to public on a website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5090ER)
2020-10-07SenateEnrolled
2020-10-02SenateTitle replaced 20201208D-H1
2020-10-02SenateHouse substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House with substitute with amendment (97-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB5090H1
2020-09-25HouseFloor Amendment by Delegate Sickles agreed to
2020-09-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201208D-H1
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-17HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201208D-H1
2020-09-17HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N)
2020-08-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB5090S1
2020-08-26SenateEmergency clause deleted
2020-08-26SenateSubstitute by Senator Dunnavant agreed to 20200957D-S1
2020-08-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-08-26SenateCommittee amendments rejected
2020-08-26SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-08-26SenateRead second time
2020-08-26SenateFloor substitute printed 20200957D-S1 (Dunnavant)
2020-08-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-08-19SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2020-08-18SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-08-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200653D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32123(n/a)See Bill Text
32141(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5090&202+sum+SB5090
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5090+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5090S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5090H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5090ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S04V0021+SB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0018SB5090+SB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0037SB5090+SB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H12V0023+SB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0096+SB5090
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0204SB5090+SB5090

Bill Comments

feedback