VA SB5088 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; landlord remedies; noncompliance with rental agreement; payment plan. Changes from five to 14 days the amount of time that landlords who own four or fewer rental dwelling units must wait after serving written notice on a tenant notifying the tenant of his nonpayment of rent and of the landlord's intention to terminate the rental agreement if rent is not paid before the landlord may pursue remedies for termination of the rental agreement. The bill requires a landlord who owns more than four rental dwelling units, or more than a 10 percent interest in more than four rental dwelling units, before terminating a rental agreement due to nonpayment of rent, to serve upon such tenant a written notice informing the tenant of the total amount due and owed and offer the tenant a payment plan under which the tenant must pay the total amount due and owed in equal monthly installments over a period of the lesser of six months or the time remaining under the rental agreement. The bill also outlines the remedies a landlord has if a tenant fails to pay the total amount due and owed or enter into a payment arrangement within 14 days of receiving notice or if the tenant enters into a payment arrangement but fails to pay within 14 days of the due date any rent that becomes due under the payment plan or arrangement after such plan or arrangement becomes effective. The bill clarifies that a tenant is not precluded from participating in any other rent relief programs available to the tenant through a nonprofit organization or under the provisions of a federal, state, or local law, regulation, or action. The bill contains an emergency clause. The bill sunsets on July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord &Tenant Act; landlord remedies, noncompliance with rental agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-09 - House - House: VOTE: (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 and #4 (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 and #2 (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 40-N) (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0054)
2020-11-09HouseEnacted, Chapter 54 (effective 11/9/20)
2020-11-09SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-11-09HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-11-09SenateReenrolled bill text (SB5088ER2)
2020-11-09HouseReenrolled
2020-11-09 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-11-09 Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation
2020-11-09HouseVOTE: (57-Y 41-N)
2020-11-09HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (57-Y 41-N)
2020-11-09SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation #3 and #4 (22-Y 17-N)
2020-11-09SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation #1 and #2 (37-Y 2-N)
2020-10-28SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-16SenateSigned by President
2020-10-16SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5088ER)
2020-10-16SenateEnrolled
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (26-Y 12-N)
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 40-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (57-Y 40-N)
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Price, Bulova, Morefield
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Ebbin, Bell, Boysko
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07SenateSenate acceded to request (34-Y 2-N)
2020-10-07HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-10-07HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-10-02SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N)
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (55-Y 42-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House with substitute (55-Y 42-N)
2020-09-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB5088H1
2020-09-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201225D-H1
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201225D-H1
2020-09-21HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N)
2020-08-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5088S1
2020-08-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20200860D-S1
2020-08-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-08-26SenateRead second time
2020-08-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-08-19SenateIncorporates SB5086 (Bell)
2020-08-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200860D-S1
2020-08-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-17SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-08-17SenatePresented and ordered printed 20200827D

Same As/Similar To

HB5064 (Same As) 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0046)
SB5086 (Same As) 2020-08-19 - Incorporated by General Laws and Technology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511245(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5088
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5088+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5088S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5088H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5088ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5088ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0054+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S12V0003+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0019SB5088+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0037SB5088+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H11V0014+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0091+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0203SB5088+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0232SB5088+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0286SB5088+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0196+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0312SB5088+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0313SB5088+SB5088
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0228+SB5088

Bill Comments

feedback