VA SB508 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund. Shifts the administration of the Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund from the Department of Conservation and Recreation to the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board (the Board). The bill expands from nine to 11 the membership of the Board with the addition of two nonlegislative members, one of whom shall be appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates from a flood-prone community outside the Chesapeake Bay watershed and one of whom shall be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules from a flood-prone community in the Chesapeake Bay watershed. The bill raises from five to six the number of Board members needed to constitute a quorum, at least four of whom shall be farmer or district director representatives. Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board; Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund. Shifts the administration of the Virginia Community Flood Preparedness Fund from the Department of Conservation and Recreation to the Virginia Soil and Water Conservation Board (the Board). The bill expands from nine to 11 the membership of the Board with the addition of two nonlegislative members, one of whom shall be appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates from a flood-prone community outside the Chesapeake Bay watershed and one of whom shall be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules from a flood-prone community in the Chesapeake Bay watershed. The bill raises from five to six the number of Board members needed to constitute a quorum, at least four of whom shall be farmer or district director representatives.
Title
Virginia Community Preparedness Fund; shifts administration to Water and Soil Conservation Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 40-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 22108073D-S2 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB508ER) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB508S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105738D-S1 |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105738D-S1 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103975D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 603.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 603.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 603.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |