VA SB508 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws and Technology
Pending: Senate General Laws and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Human Resource Management; local option health insurance plan; brand-name medications. Provides for the local option health insurance plan developed by the Department of Human Resource Management to include coverage for brand-name medications rather than generic medications if deemed necessary by the treating physician.
Title
Local option health insurance plan; coverage for brand-name medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Left in General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Recommitted to General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104688D-E |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB508E |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104688D |