VA SB508 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of unmanned aircraft system; public bodies. Allows an unmanned aircraft system to be deployed without a warrant (i) by a law-enforcement officer to survey the scene of an accident for the purpose of crash reconstruction and record photographic or video images of the scene and (ii) by the Department of Transportation when assisting a law-enforcement officer to prepare a report of such accident because of personal injury, death, or property damage of $1,500 or more. This bill is identical to HB 1482.
Title
Unmanned aircraft systems; use by Department of State Police and Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB508ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Title replaced 18107306D-H1 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB508H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18107306D-H1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107306D-H1 |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB508S1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105739D-S1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105739D-S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104197D |