VA SB508 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Corporate income tax; addback for Captive REIT dividends. Provides that the voting power or value of the beneficial interests or shares in a real estate investment trust (REIT) that is held in a segregated asset account of a life insurance corporation shall not be taken into consideration when determining if the REIT is a Captive REIT for corporate income tax purposes. Under current law, no deduction from corporate income is allowed for dividends paid by a Captive REIT. The bill modifies current law for purposes of determining whether a REIT is a Captive REIT that will not be allowed a deduction for the dividends it pays. The bill is effective for taxable year 2016 and thereafter.
Title
Corporate income tax; addback for Captive REIT dividends.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102015D |