VA SB5071 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers. Provides that if a retired law-enforcement officer was employed by a local school division as a school security officer on January 1, 2020, and had a bona fide break in service of at least one month between retirement and employment as a school security officer, such person is not required to establish a 12-month break in service that would otherwise be required by law. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-03SenatePassed by indefinitely in Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
2020-08-17SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-17SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200526D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
511155(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback