VA SB5068 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Student safety drills and student health screenings; waiver; emergency. Permits any school board to waive any mandatory student safety drill and any mandatory student health screening until such time as the General Assembly reconsiders such waivers during the 2021 regular session of the General Assembly. The bill contains an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student safety drills and student health screenings; school boards to waiver drills & screenings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N)
2020-08-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-08-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-08-19SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-08-17SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-08-17SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200635D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback