VA SB5051 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; temporary prohibition against landlord termination of rental agreements or actions to obtain possession of a dwelling unit under certain circumstances. Prohibits the termination of rental agreements and the issuance of orders of possession and writs of eviction for any reason, except in response to a criminal or willful act that is not remediable and that poses a threat to health or safety, until after April 30, 2021.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; temporary prohibition against landlord termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20201061D-S1 |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200703D |