VA SB505 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-02 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Standards of Learning assessments; reporting results. Requires the Department of Education to report the results of individual students on the Standards of Learning assessments to the local school divisions by June 30 of each year.
Title
Standards of Learning assessments; reporting results.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-02 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Continued to 2017 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101027D |