VA SB5045 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission; Department of Planning and Budget; fiscal impact statements. Requires the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission to prepare a fiscal impact statement reflecting the operating costs attributable to and necessary appropriations for any bill that would result in a net decrease in periods of imprisonment in state adult correctional facilities. The bill requires the Department of Planning and Budget to prepare a fiscal impact statement reflecting the operating costs attributable to and necessary appropriations for any bill that would result in a net decrease in periods of commitment to the custody of the Department of Juvenile Justice. The bill contains a reenactment clause and requires the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission and the Department of Planning and Budget to conduct pilot programs in which they each prepare such fiscal impact statements for four referred bills for submission to the General Assembly by December 15, 2020.
Title
Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission, et al.; required to prepare fiscal impact statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20200160D-E |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB5045E |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-08-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200160D |