VA SB5042 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospices; visitation; public health emergency. Requires the Board of Health to amend regulations governing nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospices to require that, during a public health emergency related to COVID-19, each nursing home, certified nursing facility, and hospice establish a protocol to allow each patient to receive visits, consistent with guidance from the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and as directed by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and the Board of Health. The bill contains an emergency clause and requires the Department of Health to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the act to be effective within 280 days of its enactment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing homes, certified nursing facilities, and hospice facilities; public health emergency, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
2020-10-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 10/21/20)
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5042ER)
2020-10-07SenateEnrolled
2020-10-02SenateHouse amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-09-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-17HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-08-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB5042S1
2020-08-27SenateSubstitute by Senator Kiggans agreed to 20201019D-S1
2020-08-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-08-27SenateAmendments by Senator Cosgrove withdrawn
2020-08-27SenateRead second time
2020-08-27SenateFloor substitute printed 20201019D-S1 (Kiggans)
2020-08-26SenatePassed by for the day
2020-08-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-08-19SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-08-15SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-08-15SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200357D

Same As/Similar To

HB5041 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 10 (effective 10/21/20)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321127(n/a)See Bill Text
321162.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5042&202+sum+SB5042
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5042+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5042S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5042ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0011+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S04V0008+SB5042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0018SB5042+SB5042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0046SB5042+SB5042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H12V0020+SB5042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0083+SB5042
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0199SB5042+SB5042

Bill Comments

feedback