VA SB5041 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to Committee on Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence; effective date. Amends the delayed enactment clause for Chapter 390 and the delayed enactment clause for Chapter 1130 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020 so that the provisions of such chapters will take effect on July 1, 2021, instead of January 1, 2021. The bill has an emergency clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence, changes effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-08-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
2020-08-27SenatePrinted as engrossed 20200524D-E
2020-08-27SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB5041E
2020-08-27SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-08-27SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-08-27SenateRead second time
2020-08-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
2020-08-20SenateReported from Judiciary with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-14SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-08-14SenatePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200524D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback