VA SB5039 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 7 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of Governor; purchase of personal protective equipment during a disaster caused by a communicable disease of public health threat. Grants the Governor authority during a disaster caused by a communicable disease of public health threat for which a state of emergency has been declared to establish a program through which the Governor may purchase personal protective equipment (PPE) for private, nongovernmental entities and distribute the PPE to such private, nongovernmental entities. The bill exempts the Governor's procurement of such PPE from the provisions of the Virginia Public Procurement Act, but requires the Governor to provide for competition where practicable and include a written statement regarding the basis for awarding any contract. The bill also requires the Department of Emergency Management to consult with and survey private, nongovernmental entities prior to implementing any such program in order to assess demand for participation in the program, as well as the quantity and types of personal protective equipment such entities would like to procure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Services and Disaster Law; powers and duties of Governor, purchase of PPE.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5039ER)
2020-10-07SenateEnrolled
2020-10-02SenateTitle replaced 20201215D-H1
2020-10-02SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (65-Y 32-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House with substitute (65-Y 32-N)
2020-09-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB5039H1
2020-09-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201215D-H1
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201215D-H1
2020-09-21HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-09-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 20200758D-E
2020-09-04SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB5039E
2020-09-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-09-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-09-04SenateRead second time
2020-09-03SenateRead first time
2020-09-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-14SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-08-14SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200758D

Same As/Similar To

HB5050 (Same As) 2020-10-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5050ER)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224343(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5039&202+sum+SB5039
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5039+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5039E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5039H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5039ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S12V0011+SB5039
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0010+SB5039
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0091SB5039+SB5039
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H11V0013+SB5039
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0089+SB5039
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0198SB5039+SB5039

Bill Comments

feedback