VA SB5038 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to Committee on Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Sep 21 in Virtual Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Comprehensive crisis services; mental health awareness response and community understanding services (Marcus) alert system. Directs the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to develop a comprehensive crisis service continuum comprised of a crisis call center, mobile crisis teams, crisis stabilization centers, and a Marcus alert system. The Department, in collaboration with stakeholders, shall develop a plan for the implementation of a Marcus alert system by July 1, 2021, and requires that every locality be served by a Marcus alert system by July 1, 2022. The bill also directs the Department of Criminal Justice Services to develop a plan for law-enforcement's role in the Marcus alert system and protocols for law-enforcement participations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health crises; DCJS to assist DBHDS, etc., with development of Marcus alert system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 12-N) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-16SenatePassed Senate (25-Y 12-N)
2020-09-16SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 15-N)
2020-09-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5038S2
2020-09-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201007D-S2
2020-09-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-15SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20200914D-S1
2020-09-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-15SenateRead second time
2020-09-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201007D-S2
2020-09-09SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N)
2020-08-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-20SenateIncorporates SB5084 (McClellan)
2020-08-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200914D-S1
2020-08-20SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N 2-A)
2020-08-14SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-08-14SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200617D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text
91187.1(n/a)See Bill Text
91188.1(n/a)See Bill Text
91189.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback