VA SB5034 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Release of prisoners. Provides that any person serving a sentence imposed upon a conviction for a felony offense other than those enumerated in the bill as exceptions to eligibility and who is terminally ill as defined in the bill is eligible for consideration by the Parole Board for conditional release.
Title
Terminally ill prisoners; conditional release, sentence credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-09 - House - House: VOTE: (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 33-N) (Y: 2 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 33-N) (Y: 2 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 8-N) (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052) | |
2020-11-09 | House | Enacted, Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/22 - see bill) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB5034ER2) |
2020-11-09 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-11-09 | House | VOTE: (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-11-09 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (22-Y 17-N) |
2020-10-28 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020 | |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020 |
2020-10-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5034ER) |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) |
2020-10-14 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-10-14 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 20201334D-S2 |
2020-10-14 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-10-07 | House | Delegates: Scott, Herring, Miyares |
2020-10-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Senators: Boysko, Surovell, Cosgrove |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (21-Y 15-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-10-07 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-10-07 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 33-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Passed House with substitute (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB5034H1 |
2020-10-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20201238D-H1 |
2020-10-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 20201238D-H1 |
2020-09-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 8-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N) |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5034S1 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20201151D-S1 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20201151D-S1 |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200695D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 202.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 40.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |