VA SB5033 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Court authority in criminal cases; prosecutorial discretion to dispose of a criminal case. Requires a court to grant a motion to dismiss made by the Commonwealth, whether with or without prejudice, and with the consent of the defendant unless the court finds by clear and convincing evidence that the motion was made as the result of (i) bribery or (ii) bias or prejudice toward a victim because of the race, religious conviction, gender, disability, gender identity, sexual orientation, color, or national origin of the victim.
Title
Court authority in criminal cases; prosecutorial discretion to dispose of a criminal case.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 6-N) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 6-N) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5033ER) |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Title replaced 20201236D-H1 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed House with substitute (53-Y 44-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB5033H1 |
2020-09-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20201236D-H1 |
2020-09-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 20201236D-H1 |
2020-09-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 7-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 6-N) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5033S1 |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20200796D-S1 |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20200796D-S1 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200573D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 265.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 298.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |