VA SB5030 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Policing reform. Adds law-enforcement officers to those persons who are guilty of a Class 6 felony if they are in a position of authority over and carnally know without force, threat, or intimidation any inmate, parolee, probationer, arrestee, detainee, or pretrial defendant or posttrial offender, including those in the custody of a private, local, or state law-enforcement agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Policing reform; acquisition of military property, training of officers in de-escalation techniques.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendments by Senator Stanely rejected (19-Y 20-N) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
2020-09-10SenateMotion to rerefer to Judiciary committee rejected
2020-09-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5030S2
2020-09-09SenateAmendments by Senator Stanely rejected (19-Y 20-N)
2020-09-09SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-09-09SenateSubstitute from Senator Stanley ruled out of order 20201148D-S3
2020-09-09SenateCommittee substitute from Finance and Appropriations agreed to 20200909D-S2
2020-09-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-09SenateCommittee substitute from Judiciary rejected 20200823D-S1
2020-09-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-09SenateRead second time
2020-09-09SenateFloor substitute printed 20201148D-S3 (Stanley)
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200909D-S2
2020-09-03SenateIncorporates SB5049 (Morrissey)
2020-09-03SenateIncorporates SB5037 (Favola)
2020-09-03SenateIncorporates SB5005 (Norment)
2020-09-03SenateIncorporates SB5002 (Norment)
2020-09-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2020-08-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200823D-S1
2020-08-18SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
2020-08-13SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-08-13SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200384D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521609.10(n/a)See Bill Text
1521705(n/a)See Bill Text
1521707(n/a)See Bill Text
1521709(n/a)See Bill Text
1521721.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521722.1(n/a)See Bill Text
18264.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192201(n/a)See Bill Text
19256(n/a)See Bill Text
19283.3(n/a)See Bill Text
19283.7(n/a)See Bill Text
225515(n/a)See Bill Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text
91108(n/a)See Bill Text
91112(n/a)See Bill Text
91112.1(n/a)See Bill Text
91168(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback