VA SB5025 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-17 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board and Commissioner of Health; emergency orders and regulations; duration. Provides that any emergency order or regulation adopted by the Board of Health shall be valid for no more than 30 days and that such order may be extended by the Board of Health for a subsequent period of 30 days but that in no case shall such emergency order or regulation be valid for more than 18 months from the effective date of the initial order or regulation. The bill also provides that in any case in which the Commissioner of Health exercises the authority of the Board of Health to enact an emergency order or regulation, such order or regulation shall be valid for no more than 30 days from the effective date of the order or regulation unless the Board of Health adopts an order or regulation to such effect.
Title
Emergency orders and regulations; orders adopted by the Board and Commissioner of Health, duration.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] | Sen. Siobhan Dunnavant [R] | Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] |
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. David Suetterlein [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - House: Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (11-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200117D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
35 | 1 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |