VA SB5024 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement misconduct. Authorizes the Attorney General to file a civil suit or inquire into or seek to conciliate, through the Division of Human Rights, any unlawful pattern and practice against the Commonwealth or a locality whenever the Attorney General has reasonable cause to believe that law-enforcement officers of any agency of the Commonwealth or any locality are engaging in a pattern or practice that deprives persons of rights, privileges, or immunities secured or protected by the laws of the United States and the Commonwealth. The bill also empowers the Attorney General to issue a civil investigative demand if the Attorney General has reasonable cause to believe that an unlawful pattern and practice violation has occurred. The bill authorizes the Attorney General to enter into a conciliation agreement with a locality to resolve an unlawful pattern and practice, and provides that such agreement may include a court-enforceable deprivation of certain local funds if the locality fails to abide by the agreement.
Title
Law-enforcement; Attorney Gen. authorized to file civil suit or inquire into any unlawful practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0019) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 19 (effective 3/1/21) | |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5024ER) |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Passed House (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-10-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-29 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20200402D-E |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB5024E |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Lucas agreed to |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 5-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200402D |
Same As/Similar To
HB5072 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)