VA SB5018 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - 1st day of the 4th month following the month of adjournment, sine die, of this special session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Conditional release of terminally ill prisoners. Provides that any person serving a sentence imposed upon a conviction for a felony offense other than those enumerated in the bill as exceptions to eligibility and who is terminally ill as defined in the bill is eligible for consideration by the Parole Board for conditional release.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Terminally ill prisoners; conditional release.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (55-Y 36-N) (Y: 55 N: 36 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (22-Y 13-N) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 36-N) (Y: 0 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N) (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28Senate1st day of the 4th month following the month of adjournment, sine die, of this special session)
2020-10-28 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 33 (Per Article IV, Section 13, this bill will be effective on the
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-16SenateSigned by President
2020-10-16SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5018ER)
2020-10-16SenateEnrolled
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (55-Y 36-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (55-Y 36-N)
2020-10-14HousePassed by temporarily
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2020-10-14SenateConference substitute printed 20201347D-S2
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Watts, Scott, Bloxom
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Bell, Mason, Hanger
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07SenateSenate acceded to request (22-Y 13-N)
2020-10-07HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-10-07HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-10-07SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 36-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 41-N)
2020-10-02HousePassed House with substitute (55-Y 41-N)
2020-10-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB5018H1
2020-10-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201268D-H1
2020-10-02HouseCommittee amendment rejected
2020-10-02HouseRead third time
2020-09-29HouseRead second time
2020-09-25HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2020-09-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201268D-H1
2020-09-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 7-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N)
2020-09-15SenatePrinted as engrossed 20201138D-ES1
2020-09-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB5018ES1
2020-09-15SenateAmendment by Senator Bell agreed to
2020-09-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-09-15SenateAmendment by Senator Surovell withdrawn
2020-09-15SenateRead second time
2020-09-10SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-10SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5018S1
2020-09-09SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201138D-S1
2020-09-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-09SenateRead second time
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201138D-S1
2020-09-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2020-08-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (8-Y 7-N)
2020-08-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-08-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200163D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53140.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5018&202+sum+SB5018
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5018+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5018S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5018ES1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5018H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5018S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5018ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S09V0003+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0016+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0086SB5018+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0106SB5018+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0120SB5018+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H08V0039+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0036+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0101+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0243SB5018+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0262SB5018+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0281SB5018+SB5018
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0203+SB5018

Bill Comments

feedback