VA SB5017 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Local correctional facility; definition. Provides that, for purposes of minimum standards for correctional facilities and enforcement of those standards, the term "local correctional facility" shall also include any facility owned, maintained, or operated by any political subdivision or combination of political subdivisions of the Commonwealth that is used for the detention or incarceration of people pursuant to a contract or third-party contract with the federal government or any agency or contractor thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional facility, local; clarifies definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 5-N 2-A) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (8-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0023)
2020-10-21Senatefirst day of the fourth month following the month adjournment sine die of this special session)
2020-10-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 23 (Per Article IV, Section 13, this bill will be effective on the
2020-10-14 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020
2020-10-14SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020
2020-10-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-07SenateSigned by President
2020-10-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5017ER)
2020-10-07SenateEnrolled
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N)
2020-10-02HousePassed House (55-Y 42-N)
2020-10-02HouseRead third time
2020-09-29HouseRead second time
2020-09-25HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 8-N)
2020-09-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-21HouseReported from Public Safety (13-Y 8-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 16-N)
2020-09-15SenatePrinted as engrossed 20200488D-E
2020-09-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB5017E
2020-09-15SenateAmendments by Senator Favola agreed to
2020-09-15SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-09-15SenateCommittee amendment(s) rejected
2020-09-15SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-09-15SenateSubstitute #2 by Senator Marsden withdrawn 20201169D-S2
2020-09-15SenateRead second time
2020-09-10SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-10SenateSubstitute #1 by Senator Marsden withdrawn 20201164D-S1
2020-09-10SenateCommittee amendments passed by temporarily
2020-09-10SenateRead second time
2020-09-10SenateFloor substitute printed 20201169D-S2 (Marsden)
2020-09-10SenateFloor substitute printed 20201164D-S1 (Marsden)
2020-09-09SenatePassed by for the day
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 5-N 2-A)
2020-08-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (8-Y 6-N 1-A)
2020-08-09SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-08-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200488D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5311(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5017&202+sum+SB5017
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5017+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5017S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5017S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5017E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5017ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0023+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S09V0002+SB5017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0015+SB5017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0086SB5017+SB5017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0121SB5017+SB5017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0023+SB5017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0037+SB5017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0100+SB5017

Bill Comments

feedback