VA SB5016 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-26 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Application of parole statutes for juveniles and persons committed upon felony offenses committed on or after January 1, 1995. Repeals the abolition of parole. The bill also provides that the Virginia Parole Board shall establish procedures for consideration of parole for persons who were previously ineligible for parole, because parole was abolished, to allow for an extension of time for reasonable cause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole statutes; application for juveniles and persons committed upon certain felony offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-26SenatePassed by indefinitely in Judiciary with letter (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-18SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2020-08-18SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2020-08-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-08-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200044D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531165.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback