VA SB5015 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Status: Introduced on August 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-09 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Summary
Budget Bill. Amends Chapter 1289 of the 2020 Acts of Assembly.
Title
Budget Bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) agreed to (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator McDougle (Item 114 #1s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #16s) agreed to (20-Y 20-N) No (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 299 #2s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator (Item 4-0.01 #3s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 479.10 #4s) (rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Stanley (Item 477 #3s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake (Item 4-5.04 #1s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake (Item 4-5.04 #1s) agreed to (20-Y 19-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Norment (Item 52 #1s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Cosgrove (Item 4-14 #4s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment agreed to (20-Y 19-N 1-A) (P.179 Item 4-14 #2s) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) agreed to (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator McDougle (Item 114 #1s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #16s) agreed to (20-Y 20-N) No (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 299 #2s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator (Item 4-0.01 #3s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 479.10 #4s) (rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Stanley (Item 477 #3s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake (Item 4-5.04 #1s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Peake (Item 4-5.04 #1s) agreed to (20-Y 19-N 1-A) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Norment (Item 52 #1s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Amendment by Senator Cosgrove (Item 4-14 #4s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendment agreed to (20-Y 19-N 1-A) (P.179 Item 4-14 #2s) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-10-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-10-07 | House | Read first time |
2020-10-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Chair votes Yea - Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) agreed to |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) agreed to (20-Y 20-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator McDougle (Item 114 #1s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #17s) rejected |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Chair votes Nay - amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #16) rejected |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Dunnavant (Item 313 #16s) agreed to (20-Y 20-N) No |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 299 #2s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator (Item 4-0.01 #3s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 4-0.01 #2s) withdrawn |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 479.10 #4s) (rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 299 #2s) by temporarily |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman (Item 4-0.01 #2s) by temporarily |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger (Item 479.10 #6s) withdrawn |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger (Item 479.10 #5s) withdrawn |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Stanley (Item 477 #3s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Peake (Item 4-5.04 #1s) rejected (19-Y 20-N 1-A) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Peake (Item 4-5.04 #1s) agreed to (20-Y 19-N 1-A) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Norment withdrawn (Item 4-14 #2s) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Norment (Item 52 #1s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Norment (Item 7 #1s) rejected |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Cosgrove (Item 4-14 #4s) rejected (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger (Item 4-14 #2s) withdrawn |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to (20-Y 19-N 1-A) (P.179 Item 4-14 #2s) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Contested committee amendment agreed to (P.175 Item 4-14 #1s) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Uncontested committee amendments agreed to |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Budget floor amendments |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Budget amendments available |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (14-Y 2-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200646D |