VA SB5014 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Minimum training standards for law-enforcement officers; crisis intervention team training. Requires all law-enforcement officers involved in a crisis intervention team program to complete a comprehensive advanced training course developed by the Department of Criminal Justice Services. The bill also directs the Department to develop modules of principles-based training to be included as part of compulsory minimum training standards subsequent to employment as a law-enforcement officer and as part of basic training and the recertification of law-enforcement officers. The bill also requires the Department to establish training standards for law-enforcement personnel concerning sensitivity and awareness of systemic and individual racism and the potential for bias-based profiling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement officers; officers to complete crisis intervention training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 14-N) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator reconsidered (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 4-N) (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0036)
2020-10-28 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 36 (effective 3/1/21)
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-14SenateSigned by President
2020-10-14SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5014ER)
2020-10-14SenateEnrolled
2020-10-07SenateTitle replaced 20201222D-H1
2020-10-07SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (22-Y 14-N)
2020-10-07SenateSubstitute by Senator reconsidered (36-Y 0-N)
2020-10-07SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 4-N)
2020-10-02HouseVOTE: Passage (96-Y 2-N)
2020-10-02HousePassed House with substitute (96-Y 2-N)
2020-10-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB5014H1
2020-10-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201222D-H1
2020-10-02HouseRead third time
2020-09-29HouseRead second time
2020-09-25HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2020-09-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201222D-H1
2020-09-21HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5014S2
2020-09-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20201152D-S2
2020-09-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-15SenateCommittee substitute rejected 20200867D-S1
2020-09-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-15SenateRead second time
2020-09-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-09-09SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201152D-S2
2020-09-09SenateIncorporates SB5113 (McDougle)
2020-09-09SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-08-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200867D-S1
2020-08-20SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-08-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-08-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200045D

Same As/Similar To

SB5113 (Similar To) 2020-09-09 - Incorporated by Finance and Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91102(n/a)See Bill Text
91188(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5014
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5014+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5014S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5014S2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5014H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5014ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+CHAP0036+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0014+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0031+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0108SB5014+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0119SB5014+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0022+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H02V0029+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0099+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0242SB5014+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0246SB5014+SB5014
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0252SB5014+SB5014

Bill Comments 750

feedback