VA SB5012 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes. Provides that individual votes of the members of the Virginia Parole Board shall be public records and subject to the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Freedom of Information Act; Virginia Parole Board member votes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - House - House: Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22HouseTabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-09SenateRead third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
2020-09-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-09-03SenateRead first time
2020-09-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (8-Y 7-N)
2020-08-27SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-27SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 6-N)
2020-08-03SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-08-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200466D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223703(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback