VA SB5007 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Sep 25 in Virtual Meeting
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal cases; sentencing reform. Provides that in a criminal case the court shall ascertain the extent of the punishment unless the accused has requested that the jury ascertain punishment or was found guilty of capital murder. The bill also provides that if a jury cannot agree on a punishment, the court shall fix punishment. The bill provides that the attorney for the Commonwealth may not demand a jury trial when an order declaring a judicial emergency has suspended criminal jury trials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal cases; sentencing reform.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-09-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201248D-H1
2020-09-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 9-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-10SenateRead third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2020-09-09SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5007S2
2020-09-09SenateCommittee substitute from Finance and Appropriations agreed to 20201006D-S2
2020-09-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-09SenateCommittee substitute from Judiciary rejected 20200902D-S1
2020-09-09SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-09-09SenateRead second time
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201006D-S2
2020-09-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2020-08-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200902D-S1
2020-08-20SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
2020-07-31SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-07-31SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200360D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192257(n/a)See Bill Text
192264.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192288(n/a)See Bill Text
192295(n/a)See Bill Text
192295.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192295.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback