VA SB5 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
STEM+C Competition Team Grant Program established. Establishes the Science, Technology, Engineering, Mathematics, and Computing (STEM+C) Competition Team Grant Program to encourage interest in STEM+C-related subject areas and support STEM+C-related extracurricular team-building activities in public schools in the Commonwealth by providing grants for use in establishing or supporting STEM+C competition teams. STEM+C Competition Team Grant Program established. Establishes the Science, Technology, Engineering, Mathematics, and Computing (STEM+C) Competition Team Grant Program to encourage interest in STEM+C-related subject areas and support STEM+C-related extracurricular team-building activities in public schools in the Commonwealth by providing grants for use in establishing or supporting STEM+C competition teams.
Title
STEM+C Competition Team Grant Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151) | |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5ER) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Title replaced 24108265D-H1 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB5H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24108265D-H1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2024-02-28 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 24108265D-H1 |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 24100492D |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-11-20 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100492D |