VA SB49 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Receipt of critically missing adult reports; Virginia Critically Missing Adult Alert Program; definition. Expands the definition of "critically missing adult" to include any missing adult, including an adult who has a developmental disability, intellectual disability, or mental illness, 18 years of age or older for the purpose of receipt of critically missing adult reports by a police or sheriff's department and the Virginia Critically Missing Adult Alert Program administered by the Department of State Police and removes from the Program the eligibility requirement that the adult is believed to have been abducted.
Title
Critically missing adult; expands definition, receipt of reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB49ER) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 22107761D-S1 |
2022-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Cordoza, Batten, Hope |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Mason, Hanger |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-07 | House | House requested conference committee |
2022-03-07 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB49H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22106956D-H1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read third time |
2022-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106956D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101581D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1060 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
HB1060 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
HB1060 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)