VA SB489 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authority to defer and dismiss a criminal case. Provides that a trial court presiding in a criminal case may, after any plea or trial, with or without a determination, finding, or pronouncement of guilt, and notwithstanding the entry of a conviction order, upon consideration of the facts and circumstances of the case, upon its own motion with the consent of the defendant, or with the agreement of the defendant and the Commonwealth, defer proceedings, defer entry of a conviction order, if none, or defer entry of a final order, and continue the case for final disposition, on such reasonable terms and conditions as may be agreed upon by the parties and placed on the record, or if there is no agreement, as may be imposed by the court. The bill provides that final disposition may include (i) conviction of the original charge, (ii) conviction of an alternative charge, or (iii) dismissal of the proceedings.
Title
Criminal cases; authority to defer and dismiss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) (Y: 1 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | No further action taken |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Watts, Scott, Collins |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Deeds, Stanley |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 38-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House with substitute (59-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB489H1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20109422D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 20109422D-H1 |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB489S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105897D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105897D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104671D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 265.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 298.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |