VA SB486 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB486

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Study; VDACS; sources, scale, and prevention of food waste in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (VDACS) to study, in consultation with the Department of Environmental Quality and stakeholders, the sources, scale, and prevention of food waste in the Commonwealth. In conducting its study, VDACS shall (i) assess the total annual statewide rate of preventable food waste received by landfills within the Commonwealth; (ii) identify the industry sectors within the Commonwealth that contribute to preventable food waste, and determine their rate of contribution to such waste; (iii) identify alternative uses of food that is wasted; and (iv) recommend policies to reduce the annual rate of preventable food waste in the Commonwealth with data-driven reduction targets and timelines, including food donation requirements for certain food waste from grocery stores and restaurants. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food waste; to study VDACS sources, scale, and prevention of food waste.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseContinued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-07SenatePassed Senate (35-Y 4-N)
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07SenatePrinted as engrossed 20104878D-E
2020-02-07SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB486E
2020-02-07SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-07SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-07SenateRead second time
2020-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-31SenateReported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104878D

Same As/Similar To

SB486 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+SB486
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB486+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+SB486E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+SB486AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB486F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+SB486FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S10C0042+SB0486
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S05C0193+SB0486
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0382SB0486+SB0486
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0403SB0486+SB0486
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+SC0405SB0486+SB0486

Bill Comments

feedback