VA SB486 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Study; VDACS; sources, scale, and prevention of food waste in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (VDACS) to study, in consultation with the Department of Environmental Quality and stakeholders, the sources, scale, and prevention of food waste in the Commonwealth. In conducting its study, VDACS shall (i) assess the total annual statewide rate of preventable food waste received by landfills within the Commonwealth; (ii) identify the industry sectors within the Commonwealth that contribute to preventable food waste, and determine their rate of contribution to such waste; (iii) identify alternative uses of food that is wasted; and (iv) recommend policies to reduce the annual rate of preventable food waste in the Commonwealth with data-driven reduction targets and timelines, including food donation requirements for certain food waste from grocery stores and restaurants. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Food waste; to study VDACS sources, scale, and prevention of food waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104878D-E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB486E |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104878D |
Same As/Similar To
SB486 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Rules by voice vote