VA SB48 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Nonpayment of wages; discriminatory actions prohibited. Prohibits an employer from discharging or otherwise discriminating against an employee because such employee has filed any complaint or instituted or caused to be instituted any proceeding related to the failure to pay wages, or has testified or is about to testify in any such proceeding. The measure authorizes the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to institute proceedings against an employer who has taken such prohibited discriminatory action. Available remedies include reinstatement of the employee, recovery of lost wages, and liquidated damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonpayment of wages; discriminatory actions prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 29-N) (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB48ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (68-Y 29-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with amendment (68-Y 29-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2020-02-21HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (14-Y 7-N)
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20100693D-E
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB48E
2020-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-11-18SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100693D

Same As/Similar To

HB337 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40133.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB48&201+sum+SB48
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB48+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB48E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB48ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S02V0096+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0265+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0048+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0048+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0048+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0048+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0048+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0271+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1173+SB0048
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0938SB0048+SB0048

Bill Comments

feedback