VA SB48 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits. Allows any person who is otherwise eligible to obtain a concealed handgun permit to carry a concealed handgun without a permit anywhere he may lawfully carry a handgun openly within the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun; eligibility to carry openly within Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Finance
2018-02-07SenateContinued to 2019 in Finance (13-Y 2-N)
2018-01-15SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-01-15SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
2017-11-22SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-11-22SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100178D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback