VA SB48 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Planning time for school teachers. Requires school boards to ensure that all school teachers are provided an average of 30 minutes a day of planning time.
Title
School teachers; school boards to ensure that all are provided planning time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-02-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education (Tata) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 084669352-E | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB48E | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Finance Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Education and Health Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2007-12-20 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2007-12-20 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084669352 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB48 |