VA SB476 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School principals; incident reports. Provides that school principals are not required to report criminal misdemeanors or status offenses to law enforcement if in the principal's discretion, based on a totality of the circumstances and consistent with Board of Education guidelines, such report is not warranted. The bill requires the Board of Education, in consultation with the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Office of the Attorney General, and any interested stakeholders, to update its Student Conduct Policy Guidelines to provide guidance for principals in exercising such discretion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School principals; incident reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-03-02HouseContinued to 2019 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2018-02-26HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
2018-02-23HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05HouseRead first time
2018-02-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-30SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29SenateRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2018-01-09SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-09SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102416D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.3:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback