VA SB475 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB475

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Court appearance of a person not free on bail. Makes various changes to provisions regarding bail hearings, including (i) the appointment of counsel for the accused, (ii) the information provided to counsel for the accused, (iii) a requirement that counsel for the accused be provided with adequate time to confer with the accused prior to any bail hearing, and (iv) the compensation of counsel for the accused. Effective in due course, the bill provides that the chief judge in each circuit shall create a plan to be completed by October 1, 2022, that establishes the means by which the jurisdiction will meet these requirements. The remainder of the bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court appearance of a person not free on bail; changes to provisions regarding bail hearings, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-11-21SenateLeft in Finance and Appropriations
2022-02-10SenateContinued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2022-02-07SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2022-02-07SenateReported from Judiciary with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
2022-01-31SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2022-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2022-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101039D

Same As/Similar To

SB475 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192158(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback